SHOUT (SCHEME TO HELP OTHERS BY THE UNDER TWENTIES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with young people in the area of volunteering from the ages of 7 to 18
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2015
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 07 July 1994: Standard registration
- SHOUT (SCHEME TO HELP OTHERS UNDER TWENTIES) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEXINA SNEDDON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN TAPLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CELIA GOODBAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICK PERRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS TINA GOODBAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH MARY POTTER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.28k | £3.68k | £3.41k | £1.84k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £764 | £1.26k | £1.58k | £1.84k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 285 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 285 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 651 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 651 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1016 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1016 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1381 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1381 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1746 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1746 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 19 APRIL 1994 AND 3 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 7 TO 20 WITHIN LINCOLNSHIRE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHIRLOW COTTAGE
MAIN STREET
HOUGHAM
GRANTHAM
NG32 2JD
- Phone:
- 01400250648
- Email:
- jmpwhirlow@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
SHOUT.(SchemetoHelpOthersbytheUnderTwenties
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window