DEMENTIA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dementia UK provides specialist dementia support for families through our Admiral Nurse service. Admiral Nurses work alongside families, giving them the one-to-one support, expert guidance and practical solutions they need. Dementia UK also runs Admiral Nursing Direct, a free and confidential helpline for anyone with concerns about dementia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£22,541,874
Donations and legacies | £21.67m | |
Charitable activities | £496.43k | |
Other trading activities | £111.80k | |
Investments | £266.85k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£18,821,580
Raising funds | £7.07m | |
Charitable activities | £11.75m | |
Other | £0 |
-£14,997 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £7.07m | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.75m | |
Retained for future use | £3.72m |
People

238 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 17 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 March 2001: Standard registration
- ADMIRAL NURSES (Working name)
- ADMIRAL NURSING DIRECT (Working name)
- FOR DEMENTIA (Working name)
- FOR DEMENTIA FOR DEMENTIA TRAINING (Working name)
- FOR DEMENTIA PLUS (Working name)
- FOR DEMENTIA TRAINING (Working name)
- UNITING CARERS FOR DEMENTIA (Working name)
- THE DEMENTIA RELIEF TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR DAVID CROISDALE-APPLEBY | Chair | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Murphy | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Burns | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Ball | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Stewart | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Elizabeth Shinkwin | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Jane Keir | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JAMES ROE | Trustee | 19 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Philippa Blane Armitage | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Anthony Sanderson | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MARK PTARMIGAN DOUGLAS STROYAN | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.89m | £15.81m | £17.13m | £19.42m | £22.54m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.84m | £9.94m | £15.13m | £17.73m | £18.82m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £10.65m | £15.24m | £16.12m | £18.79m | £21.67m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £80.72k | £95.21k | £98.68k | £83.98k | £111.80k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £116.08k | £325.70k | £880.74k | £451.79k | £496.43k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £41.77k | £23.70k | £8.15k | £100.57k | £266.85k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.97k | £127.53k | £19.32k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.27m | £2.36m | £1.93m | £2.81m | £3.70m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.00m | £6.78m | £10.51m | £11.80m | £11.75m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.81m | £3.15m | £4.62m | £5.93m | £7.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £61.94k | £131.21k | £176.82k | £247.93k | £424.82k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £325.00k | £616.54k | £2.48m | £1.73m | £426.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £68 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £29.44k | £9.62k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £202.85k | £224.63k | £88.63k | £122.14k | £224.68k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.03m | £2.06m | |
|
Other assets | £7.28m | £13.39m | £17.67m | £17.73m | £19.65m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.00m | £2.26m | £4.41m | £4.81m | £3.27m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JUNE 1994, AS AMENDED 13TH DECEMBER 2001. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 23RD MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 DEC 2019 as amended on 28 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: 2.1 THE PROVISION OF PROFESSIONAL NURSES TO SUPPORT, HELP AND CARE FOR THOSE CARING FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA (THE SERVICE TO BE KNOWN AS THE ADMIRAL NURSE SERVICE AND THENURSES AS ADMIRAL NURSES). 2.2 THE RELIEF AND CARE OF THE FRIENDS, RELATIVES AND CARERS OF THOSE WHO ARE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA. 2.3 THE RELIEF, CARE AND TREATMENT OF PEOPLE WHO ARE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA. 2.4 THE DEVELOPMENT OF A PROGRAMME OF PRACTICAL RESEARCH AND THE PROMOTION OF STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO:- 2.4.1 UNDERSTANDING THE CAUSES NATURE AND EFFECTS OF DEMENTIA AND INTO MANAGING CARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA, 2.4.2 SUPPORTING PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR RELATIVES, FRIENDS OR CARERS, AND THE PUBLICATION OF USEFUL RESULTS OF ALL SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH. 2.5 THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT DEMENTIA AND THE INDIRECT EFFECTS ON, AND THE NEEDS OF, PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR RELATIVES, FRIENDS AND CARERS. 2.6 TO ENGAGE IN ANY CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES WHATSOEVER WHICH MAY PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE RELATIVES, FRIENDS AND CARERS OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 16 March 2001 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
7th Floor
One Aldgate
LONDON
EC3N 1RE
- Phone:
- 02080365400
- Email:
- info@dementiauk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window