Financial history WYSING ARTS CHARITY

Charity number: 1039555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £917.44k £626.16k £762.25k £634.42k £716.75k
Total expenditure £963.92k £632.68k £759.74k £693.09k £679.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £493.77k £12.13k N/A £15.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £20.05k £15.43k £15.85k £15.29k £24.31k
Income - Other trading activities £3.05k £467 £3.15k £12.48k £4.17k
Income - Charitable activities £865.62k £607.30k £709.90k £570.03k £644.99k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.94k £2.18k £1.30k £3.10k £7.79k
Income - Other £25.79k £789 £32.05k £33.57k £35.48k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £883.20k £609.74k £739.16k £648.80k £670.07k
Expenditure - Raising funds £80.72k £22.95k £20.58k £44.29k £9.30k
Expenditure - Governance £6.57k £7.92k £6.44k £6.45k £6.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0