EMPOWERME

Charity number: 1040349
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim of eMpowerMe is to promote, develop and support mental health service user involvement throughout the community. We provide an alternative choice to statutory services, support and develop service user groups, support and develops projects to address unmet needs, as well as providing comprehensive training on mental health awareness to voluntary and statutory groups and organisations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011

Total income: £166,538
Total expenditure: £173,225

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 August 1994: Standard registration
  • 30 March 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 30 March 2015: Funds transferred to 702233 COMMUNITY COUNCIL OF LANCASHIRE
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LANCASHIRE ADVOCACY (Working name)
  • LANCASHIRE ADVOCACY DEVELOPMENT AND SUPPORT SERVICE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £148.03k £102.21k £169.54k £153.87k £166.54k
Total expenditure £144.63k £111.16k £125.23k £126.87k £173.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 12 November 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 04 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 21 September 2011 On Time