CHILD BEREAVEMENT UK

Charity number: 1040419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relieves sickness amongst persons affected by the death of a baby or child or when children are bereaved by providing appropriate information and support and educates the public by providing accessible training for the all who work with these families and children.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 August 1994: Standard registration
  • 04 January 2017: Funds received from 1105464 SAND ROSE PROJECT
  • 04 May 2017: Funds received from 1150429 HENLEY SUMMER FIREWORKS
  • 17 February 2022: Funds received from 1180509 CHILDREN ARE BUTTERFLIES LTD
  • 13 February 2024: Funds received from 1030762 HOLY CROSS UNDER 5'S GROUP
  • 15 November 2024: Funds received from 326995 THE FORBES CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • C B T (Working name)
  • CHILD BEREAVEMENT CHARITY (Previous name)
  • THE CHILD BEREAVEMENT TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexander Seamus FITZGIBBONS Chair 16 July 2019
None on record
Peter West Trustee 24 July 2024
THE NORTH LONDON CONSERVATOIRE
Received: On time
Shareen Jivraj-Virani Trustee 24 July 2024
None on record
Therese Mayhew Trustee 06 February 2023
None on record
LORNA IRELAND Trustee 09 February 2022
None on record
TIM MANASSEH Trustee 05 November 2019
None on record
DEBORAH EATON QC Trustee 12 July 2018
None on record
KRISTEN STEFANIA WELDON Trustee 28 April 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.42m £4.92m £2.36m £4.22m £3.88m
Total expenditure £4.15m £3.92m £2.91m £3.42m £3.94m
Income from government contracts £79.66k £235.22k £260.93k £285.14k £174.86k
Income from government grants £43.01k £118.37k N/A N/A £142.23k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.99m £3.87m £1.68m £3.13m £2.80m
Income - Other trading activities £806.44k £567.11k £241.25k £482.21k £424.24k
Income - Charitable activities £593.16k £427.65k £426.93k £575.73k £583.54k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £24.71k £56.56k £11.98k £27.68k £72.89k
Income - Other £24.25k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £900.00k £200.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.88m £2.99m £2.22m £2.45m £2.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.27m £927.74k £692.52k £963.32k £1.04m
Expenditure - Governance £57.78k £212.74k £32.86k £139.95k £140.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £313.66k £293.58k £209.77k £213.59k £174.61k
Long-term investments £1.25m £1.32m £1.49m £1.99m £1.88m
Other assets £2.23m £3.26m £2.98m £3.05m £3.09m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £197.66k £262.69k £161.33k £138.02k £134.07k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 01 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 06 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 21 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 12 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 January 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Child Bereavement UK
Unit B
Knaves Beech Industrial Estate
Knaves Beech Way
Loudwater
HIGH WYC
Phone:
01494568900