THE CHARITIES ADVISORY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To; - promote charitable giving through Card Aid and the Good Gifts Catalogue - provide opportunities to help others through volunteering (Knit for Peace - knitting for those in need at home and abroad) - provide advice and practical help to charities to enable them to be more effective. - create and fund income generating activities which provide employment and are sustainable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
40000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Angola
- Dominica
- Ghana
- India
- Israel
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Northern Ireland
- Rwanda
- Scotland
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 26 August 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rowena Dunn | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID RUSSELL | Trustee | 17 July 2014 |
|
|||||||
Leila MacTavish Mohamed | Trustee | 17 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £901.22k | £608.84k | £714.49k | £546.51k | £365.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £943.02k | £725.07k | £763.83k | £747.47k | £567.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £753.09k | £539.49k | £637.10k | £454.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £104.80k | £44.43k | £0 | £77.89k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £27.77k | £12.76k | £66.65k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £15.55k | £12.16k | £10.74k | £14.51k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £779.39k | £542.65k | £706.95k | £732.90k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £163.63k | £182.42k | £56.88k | £14.57k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.25k | £7.65k | £6.55k | £7.20k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £384.29k | £292.84k | £354.98k | £338.23k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10.38k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 May 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 24 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 29 JULY 1994
Charitable objects
(1) RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD (2) ADVANCE EDUCATION (3) PRESERVE BUILDINGS AND MONUMENTS OF ARCHITECTURAL MERIT (4) ASSIST CHARITIES SO THAT THEY MAY MAKE BETTER USE OF THEIR ASSETS AND RESOURCES BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO TRADING AND/OR FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES ON THEIR BEHALF (5) TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS DEFINED IN SECTION 97(1) CHARITIES ACT 1993
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RADIUS WORKS
BACK LANE
LONDON
NW3 1HL
- Phone:
- 02077949835
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window