THE FRIENDS OF THE CONNECTION AT ST. MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We exist to support the work of The Connection at St Martin-in-the-Fields, to raise funds for that charity and to increase awareness among the public of homelessness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 08 September 1994: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE CONNECTION (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE CONNECTION AT ST MARTIN'S (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF THE SOCIAL CARE UNIT AT ST. MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD JAMES COOPER | Chair | 19 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Rosemarie LaManno | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Whalley | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Gandini | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Keane | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mr Chris Riley | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emily Cecil-Dennett | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARY BATCHELOR | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £494.46k | £328.41k | £202.07k | £445.76k | £399.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £502.18k | £329.61k | £225.41k | £439.32k | £413.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/06/1994 AS AMENDED ON 21/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 16/06/2007 AS AMENDED ON 29/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 28/06/2014 AS AMENDED ON 04/07/2015 as amended on 29 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONNECTION AT ST MARTIN'S IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMMITTEE IN CONSULTATION WITH THE TRUSTEES OF THE CONNECTION AT ST. MARTIN'S SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE PROVIDED THAT SUCH SUPPORT DOES NOT RELIEVE EXPENDITURE WHICH A BODY OR AUTHORITY IS UNDER A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CONNECTION AT ST. MARTINS
12 ADELAIDE STREET
LONDON
WC2N 4HW
- Phone:
- 02077665522
- Email:
- friends@cstm.org.uk
- Website:
-
friendsoftheconnction.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window