THE RTPI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RTPI Trust's objects and activities are: - The provision of support and financial assistance to members and students of the Royal Town Planning Institute who are in financial hardship - To undertake research for the public benefit into town planning - The provision of support to any charitable cause associated with town planning
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 September 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Bridge | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Tant | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Askew | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Acres | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.35k | £14.87k | £60.48k | £10.98k | £10.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.35k | £12.60k | £5.46k | £12.84k | £12.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL TOWN PLANNING INSTITUTE WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP (2) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO STUDENTS OF TOWN PLANNING WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP (3) TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO TOWN PLANNING AND ITS SOCIAL DOMESTIC AND FINANCIAL EFFECTS ON THE COMMUNITY AND INTO OTHER SUCH RELEVANT FIELDS OF STUDY IN CONNECTION WITH TOWN PLANNING AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH (4) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF ANY CHARITABLE CAUSE ASSOCIATED WITH TOWN PLANNING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ROYAL TOWN PLANNING INSTITUTE
41-42 BOTOLPH LANE
LONDON
EC3R 8DL
- Phone:
- 02079299494
- Email:
- governance@rtpi.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window