Accounts and annual returns GREENHILL PLAYSCHOOL
Charity number: 1041129
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 November 2023 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 November 2023 | 136 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 October 2023 | 471 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 October 2023 | 471 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 April 2022 | 286 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 April 2022 | 286 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 April 2021 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 April 2021 | 275 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window