THE PRIDE OF BRISTOL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Following the transfer of ownership of the Vessel Pride of Bristol to the care of the National Museum of the Royal Navy Hartlepool , the charity The Pride of Bristol Trust has ceased operations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
Governance
- 11 October 1994: Standard registration
- 22 February 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 22 February 2023: Funds transferred to 301663 BRISTOL (ADVENTURE) UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
- 22 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1077265 THE PRIORY OF ENGLAND AND THE ISLANDS OF THE MOST ...
- 22 February 2023: Funds transferred to 301675 AVONMOUTH UNIT 15 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
- 22 February 2023: Funds transferred to 278672 2ND NAILSEA (HOLY TRINITY) SCOUT GROUP
- 22 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1155339 MV BALMORAL FUND LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.29k | £11.73k | £24.89k | £16.00k | £15.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.71k | £13.08k | £23.25k | £13.26k | £10.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 AUGUST 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 24 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN OR YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR TRAINING IN SAILING AND SEAMANSHIP OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. B) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE, THE FIRE AUTHORITY AND THE ROYAL NAVAL AND OTHER RESERVE SERVICES BY THE PROVISION OF ADDITIONAL TRAINING OR TRAINING FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL CHANNEL AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window