MIRACLES

Charity number: 1041449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Miracles is a charity offering hope for those with multiple and life threatening problems for whom no other help source is available. It aims to ease the burder of suffering on person or persons in Supreme Need - primarily in the UK.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 October 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helena Clavel-Flores Chair 07 November 2018
None on record
Toby Wilson Trustee 15 February 2021
MIRACLES
Recently registered
Matthew Anderson Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Sunara Louise Spires Trustee 08 July 2020
None on record
RODRIGO RODRIGUEZ MINGUELA Trustee 22 September 2016
None on record
Benjamin Charles Beresford Williams Trustee 04 May 2016
None on record
MARIE-ANTOINETTE PEREIRE Trustee
None on record
ROBERT BEAN A.C.A. Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £407.42k £235.18k £325.04k £303.77k £536.00k
Total expenditure £453.36k £322.07k £337.28k £274.31k £435.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.80k £10.00k £10.85k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £408.94k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £126.20k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £872
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.75k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £392.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £42.71k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £525.38k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £258.79k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.61k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 29 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 29 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 30 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 30 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 29 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 29 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 05 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 05 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 10 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 10 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
85 Great Portland Street
First Floor
London
W1W 7LT
Phone:
07545174243