Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BEXTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1041685
Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 29 April 2025 425 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 19 April 2023 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 15 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 06 May 2021 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required