THAXTED CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation,restoration, conservation, protection, renovation, improvement and maintenance of the fabric, furnishings, fittings and facilities of the church as a place of worship for the advancement of the Christian religion and for the benefit of the inhabitants of Thaxted for its architectural and historic interest to the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 15 November 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donald Stephen Odom | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Mary Phyllis Carter | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Elcombe | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Till | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christopher Brown | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE COMPAGNONI | Trustee | 13 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETRINA MARGARET MAWER | Trustee | 13 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
TOM WILSON | Trustee | 13 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE MUNRO | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.49k | £5.58k | £7.77k | £13.20k | £26.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.53k | £787 | £3.60k | £8.63k | £3.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
(1) THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, RENOVATION, IMPROVEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC, FURNISHING, FITTINGS AND FACILITIES OF THE CHURCH AS A PLACE OF WORSHIP FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THAXTED FOR ITS ARCHITECTURAL AND HISTORIC INTEREST TO THE AREA. (2) THE PROMOTION OR DEVELOPMENT OF THE CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 Newbiggen Street
Thaxted
DUNMOW
CM6 2QU
- Phone:
- 01371 831347
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window