COMMUNITY SECURITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CST seeks to protect Britain's diverse and vibrant Jewish community from the external threats of bigotry, antisemitism and terrorism. CST provides physical security, training and advice for the protection of British Jews, assists victims of antisemitism, monitors antisemitic activities and incidents and represents British Jewry to Police, Government and media on antisemitism and security.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£28,497,320
Donations and legacies | £10.08m | |
Charitable activities | £17.37m | |
Other trading activities | £272.75k | |
Investments | £270.02k | |
Other | £504.65k |
Total expenditure:
£26,063,217
Raising funds | £991.93k | |
Charitable activities | £25.07m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,074,239 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £17,368,546 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £991.93k | |
Charitable expenditure | £25.07m | |
Retained for future use | £2.43m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £991.93k | |
Charitable expenditure | £25.07m | |
Retained for future use | £3.51m |
People

101 Employee(s)
2000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£70k to £80k | 9 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- CST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.53m | £11.31m | £23.53m | £22.25m | £28.50m | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.16m | £11.85m | £21.89m | £21.07m | £26.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.00m | £7.57m | £15.99m | £13.92m | £17.37m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.00m | £2.96m | £7.03m | £7.76m | £10.08m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £302.59k | £286.08k | £0 | £272.75k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £14.00m | £7.57m | £15.99m | £13.92m | £17.37m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £140.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £97.82k | £50.67k | £107.96k | £270.02k | |
|
Income - Other | £532.89k | £385.79k | £200.59k | £461.74k | £504.65k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £318.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £20.61m | £11.60m | £21.31m | £20.44m | £25.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £548.56k | £246.41k | £582.41k | £632.14k | £991.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £57.43k | £66.73k | £82.98k | £37.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £13.60m | £7.46m | £15.99m | £13.87m | £16.71m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.43m | £9.65m | £5.51m | £5.35m | £648.39k | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.23m | £2.02m | £7.57m | £11.69m | £20.10m | |
|
Other assets | £10.88m | £10.95m | £12.52m | £9.36m | £11.83m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.77m | £3.33m | £3.04m | £3.58m | £6.25m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21/11/1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 12/11/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 31/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 12 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
1.1.1 TO PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATIONS BETWEEN THE JEWISH COMMUNITY AND OTHER MEMBERS OF SOCIETY BY WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACISM IN THE FORM OF ANTISEMITISM. 1.1.2 TO RELIEVE THE VICTIMS OF RACIAL OR RELIGIOUS PREJUDICE AND ESPECIALLY ANTISEMITISM WHO ARE IN NEED OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. 1.1.3 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO RACISM, ANTISEMITISM AND EXTREMISM AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND OTHERWISE TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT RACISM, ANTISEMITISM AND EXTREMISM. 1.1.4 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE WITHIN THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION OF CRIME WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO: (A) PROVIDING SECURITY ASSISTANCE TO THE JEWISH COMMUNITY; (B) THE MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC ORDER, SAFETY AND SECURITY; (C) MITIGATION, SECURITY AND PROTECTION AGAINST ANTISEMITISM AND TERRORISM; (D) PROMOTING THE SAFETY OF OR SAFEGUARDING HUMAN LIFE IN THE EVENT OF AN EMERGENCY; AND (E) RACIALLY MOTIVATED ESPECIALLY ANTISEMITIC CRIME. 1.1.6 SUBJECT TO CLAUSE 1.3 TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY SECURITY TRUST
SHIELD HOUSE
HARMONY WAY
LONDON
NW4 2BZ
- Phone:
- 02084579999
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window