Trustees BASINGSTOKE WEST DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1042738

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Leon Gath | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael Vaughan | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jon Locke | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Warmington | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Holdsworth | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kiy | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN BIRTLES | Trustee | 17 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.