THE TAIT MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust continues to present performance platforms for emerging and established performing artists from Australia & New Zealand at our many concerts and events, during the 2023-24 fiscal year. Awards totalling £100,000.00 were paid. The Tait Memorial Trust has raised more than £1,500,000 to help support young musicians and dancers who need financial assistance while they are studying in the U.K.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 December 1994: Standard registration
- TMT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ISLA BARING OAM | Chair | 12 December 1992 |
|
|
||||
Chad Daniel Vindin | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Margaret Mayston AM | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Matthew Keith Phillips | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN THORNTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
JUSTIN BARING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.51k | £105.32k | £127.76k | £158.48k | £118.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.61k | £91.69k | £102.34k | £105.11k | £130.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 February 2022 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 February 2022 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 JULY 1994 AS AMENDED ON 5 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ART OR SCIENCE OF MUSIC THE PERFORMING ARTS AND FINE ARTS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THEREIN BY ALL CHARITABLE MEANS NAMELY:- (A) PROMOTING PUBLIC LECTURES CONCERTS AND RECITALS (B) PROMOTING SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF TALENTED YOUNG STUDENTS (C) UPHOLDING AND ADVANCING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STANDARDS OF EDUCATION TRAINING AND COMPETENCE OF SUCH STUDENTS (D) ENDOWING AND AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS EXHIBITIONS BURSARIES PRIZES AND OTHER AWARDS TO ENABLE SUCH TALENTED YOUNG PERSONS TO STUDY (E) PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR THE PURCHASE OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS ACCESSORIES AND OTHER EQUIPMENT FOR SUCH PERSONS AS AFORESAID IN NEED THEREOF (F) PROVIDING FOR SUCH PERSONS AS AFORESAID WHO ARE IN NEED THEREOF WITH RECORDING FACILITIES IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY BE TRAINED IN THE ARTISTIC AND TECHNICAL USE OF SUCH FACILITIES (G) PROVIDING ONGOING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO TALENTED YOUNG STUDENTS IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE ON THE TERMINATION OF THEIR STUDIES TO HELP ESTABLISH THEM IN THEIR CAREERS; PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT ALL SUCH AWARDS PAYMENTS AND OTHER PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AS ARE MENTIONED IN (D) (E) (F) AND (G) SHALL ONLY BE MADE WHERE THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE THAT THERE IS A SPECIAL NEED TO PROVIDE SUCH ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
80 Elm Park Gardens
London
SW10 9PD
- Phone:
- 02073510561
- Email:
- info@taitmemorialtrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window