Financial history THE PRISONS VIDEO TRUST

Charity number: 1042919
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £44 £20 £0 £8 £250
Total expenditure £6.74k £2.49k £2.36k £798 £1.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A