THE PRISONS VIDEO TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Prisons Video Trust aims to improve communication and assist the rehabilitation of offenders throughout the United Kingdom through the production of honest and thought ÔÇô provoking educational videos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 December 1994: Standard registration
- PRISONS VIDEO MAGAZINE (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PETER JOHN BENNETT | Chair | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN SIMMONS | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|||||
SEAN VAN NAIDOO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY SALMON OBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HAMMOND PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44 | £20 | £0 | £8 | £250 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.74k | £2.49k | £2.36k | £798 | £1.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 17 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
FOR THE SOCIAL REHABILITATION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PRISONERS AND OTHER INMATES OF PENAL INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, TO FOCUS THE ATTENTION OF THOSE CONCERNED WITH AND WORKING IN THE PENAL SYSTEM ON SOLUTIONS TO PROBLEMS OF PRISON LIFE, TO PROVIDE A FORUM FOR THE EXCHANGE OF IDEAS WITHIN OR CONCERNING THE PRISON WORLD, AND FOR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR THE RECREATION AND CONSTRUCTIVE LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF PRISONERS AND OTHER INMATES OF PENAL INSTITUTIONS, BY THE PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION FOR EXHIBITION WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM PRISON WORLD OF AUDIO-VISUAL PROGRAMMES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SAYERS BUTTERWORTH LLP
3RD FLOOR
12 GOUGH SQUARE
LONDON
EC4A 3DW
- Phone:
- 02079361910
- Email:
- ssimmons@sayersb.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window