THE FRIENDS OF ST EBBE'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting evangelism and pastoral work amongst the students and other young people in Oxford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 05 January 1995: Standard registration
- FOSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Michael Edwin Maidment | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver William Bartlett | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mattie Susan Van der Walt | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Chan | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Margaret Green | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Felce | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ashley Stuart Bourn Carter | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|||||
SIMON NEAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev VAUGHAN EDWARD ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.29k | £154.16k | £158.31k | £143.53k | £213.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.79k | £119.39k | £128.30k | £160.92k | £184.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 13 DECEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY SUPPORTING EVANGELISM AND PASTORAL WORK AMONGST THE STUDENTS AND OTHER YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UNIVERSITIES, COLLEGES AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
CITY OF OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-2 Roger Bacon Lane
Oxford
OX1 1QE
- Phone:
- 01865722633
- Email:
- fose@stebbes.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window