WENDRON PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preschool.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 17 January 1995: Standard registration
- COBER VALLEY PLAY GROUP (Previous name)
- WENDRON P.L.A. UNDER 5'S GROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Prosser-Box | Chair | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Sumpter | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Jenkin | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Tripp | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Tripp | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julia Pascoe | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Sumpter | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nuala Shaw Treasurer | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Eva | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Thomas | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Gilbert | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER HAYWOOD | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.99k | £64.32k | £61.40k | £43.87k | £42.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.54k | £49.93k | £55.53k | £50.38k | £47.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £51.42k | £46.23k | £54.80k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.66k | £2.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/09/1994 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/2002 AS AMENDED ON 10/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE - COBER VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wendron C of E Primary School
Wendron
HELSTON
TR13 0PX
- Phone:
- 07925091662
- Email:
- wendronpreschool@gmail.com
- Website:
-
Wendronpreschool.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window