THE PEACE AND PROSPERITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through the universal language of music&by promoting young artists from the Middle East&the Western World, the Peace&Prosperity Trust raises awareness&funds for charitable projects in the M.E.&for its young artists. 'Peace' is achieved by using the language of music to produce concerts.'Prosperity' by creating awareness&funding to specific charities dealing with education, health, poverty&culture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Lebanon
Governance
- 02 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TOBY PURSER | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Christie Haddad | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
RAJAI KHOURI | Trustee | 08 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
LEILA BUHEIRY | Trustee | 08 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.00k | £9.33k | £8.88k | £9.95k | £2.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.08k | £16.21k | £10.01k | £10.48k | £8.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 August 2021 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF IN CASES OF HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN OR TAKING REFUGE IN LEBANON AND OTHER PARTS OF THE MIDDLE EAST OR FURTHERING EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS RESIDENT IN OR TAKING REFUGE IN LEBANON AND OTHER PARTS OF THE MIDDLE EAST. FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEBANON AND OTHER PARTS OF THE MIDDLE EAST
Area of benefit
LEBANON AND THE MIDDLE EAST
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIVERBANK HOUSE
1 PUTNEY BRIDGE APPROACH
LONDON
SW6 3JD
- Phone:
- 07815086279
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window