Financial history FRIENDS OF PENRYN SURGERY

Charity number: 1044117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £120 £525 £620 £389 £496
Total expenditure £0 £3.55k £729 £583 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A