HEXHAM COUNTY MIDDLE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We hold several events to raise funds during the year, which include school discos, bingo evenings, Christmas fair, summer fete and talent contest. These enable us to donate money to school funds for specific items and events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £17,941
Total expenditure: £17,983

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hilary Gail Case Trustee 20 November 2024
None on record
Karen North Trustee 20 November 2024
None on record
Gillian Hills Trustee 07 November 2024
None on record
Dawn Louise Sutton Trustee 07 November 2024
None on record
Amy Louise Coates Trustee 07 November 2024
PROJECTS4CHANGE
Received: On time
Suzanne Cadge Trustee 01 September 2021
QEHS PARENT TEACHER & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.92k £8.05k £12.47k £10.36k £17.94k
Total expenditure £2.90k £7.13k £11.33k £8.19k £17.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 26 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hexham Middle School
Whetstone Bridge Road
HEXHAM
Northumberland
NE46 3JB
Phone:
01434 610300
Website:

No information available