3.13

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE OFFER HOUSING & SUPPORT TO HOMELESS YOUNG MEN IN STOCKTON-ON-TEES WITH VARIOUS PROBLEMS WHICH CAN INCLUDE DRUG AND ALCOHOL MISUSE. WE TRY TO HELP OUR RESIDENTS TO BECOME DRUG FREE AND LIVE INDEPENDENTLY THROUGH HELP AND SUPPORT. WE SEPARATELY OPERATE A RESIDENTIAL FAMILY ASSESSMENT CENTRE AT OUR FARM IN BISHOP AUCKLAND.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £401,759 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 20 February 1995: Standard registration
- TURNAROUND HOMES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL John WINSTONE | Chair | 04 January 1994 |
|
|||||
HARRY WRIGGLESWORTH | Trustee | 14 June 2004 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS TAYLOR | Trustee | 04 January 1994 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £380.55k | £334.26k | £373.37k | £418.77k | £403.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £325.49k | £373.74k | £439.31k | £424.94k | £547.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £373.37k | £407.67k | £401.76k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4TH JANUARY 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 4 JANUARY 1995 AND 14TH JUNE 2004 as amended on 05 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF CHARITABLE SERVICES FOR THE HOMELESS, POOR AND SICK
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Maria Drive
Stockton-on-Tees
TS19 7JL
- Phone:
- 07774957106
- Email:
- turnaroundhomes@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window