THE CHESHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMENS INSTITUTES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The WI plays a unique role in providing women with educational opportunities and the chance to build new skills, to take part in a wide variety of activities and to campaign on issues that matter to them and their communities. The WI is a democratic, non-sectarian and non-party political organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 22 February 1995: Standard registration
- 19 June 2017: Funds received from 1021689 WEAVERHAM WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 11 May 2021: Funds received from 1023039 SALE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 16 July 2021: Funds received from 702284 MICKLE TRAFFORD AND DISTRICT WOMENS INSTITUTE
- 28 June 2022: Funds received from 1021792 HOOTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 06 June 2023: Funds received from 1021802 HENBURY AND DISTRICT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- CHESHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Selina Ann Prescott | Chair | 19 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Helen Tyrrell | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley June Langham | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bentley | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Lee | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jones | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Leicester | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALIA BANKS EL ASMAR | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Morris | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANN PYE | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
NORMA DENT | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN HARDING | Trustee | 16 September 2014 |
|
|||||
ANN BECKETT | Trustee | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.82k | £163.53k | £97.41k | £120.87k | £137.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.54k | £132.84k | £80.66k | £111.51k | £143.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.68k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 August 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 August 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/01/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 11/03/03 & 9/03/04. NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14/03/2014
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE PURPOSE OF THE WOMENS INSTITUTE MOVEMENT IN CHESHIRE COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 WHITE FRIARS
CHESTER
CH1 1NZ
- Phone:
- 01244347462
- Email:
- info@cheshirewi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window