Financial history HOPE UK

Charity Number: 1044475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £291.99k £115.07k £96.92k £125.90k £307.83k
Total expenditure £295.15k £296.66k £334.76k £306.36k £319.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £17.97k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A