THE ACTORS OF DIONYSUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
National & international touring theatre company, specialising in new adaptations of ancient Greek drama & new writing inspired by myth, performed in a bold, accessible & physical style. We work with many new & established artistic collaborators to create exciting & dynamic work. We also have a strong educational outreach programme of workshops, talk-backs, publications, DVDS & audio-CDs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £29,447 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 February 1995: Standard registration
- AOD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Despoina Christianoudi | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bristow | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bernadette Barker | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mai Musie | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Macintosh | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Warren | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Beaton | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
OLGA GEKHT | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEORGE GREGORY BULLEN | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.86k | £100.06k | £47.85k | £29.86k | £80.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.74k | £54.14k | £68.68k | £50.27k | £66.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.20k | £59.42k | £28.93k | £1.50k | £29.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 DECEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS WITH PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE REFERENCE TO THE ART OF THE THEATRE AND GREEK CLASSICAL DRAMA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 St. Lukes Road
BRIGHTON
BN2 9ZD
- Phone:
- 01273 673691
- Email:
- info@actorsofdionysus.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window