Financial history HUNTINGDON FREEMEN'S TRUST

Charity number: 1044573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £538.86k £478.03k £551.57k £560.08k £763.35k
Total expenditure £519.18k £607.14k £532.69k £627.80k £529.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £101.99k
Income - Charitable activities £114.04k N/A £126.10k £107.72k £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £424.82k N/A £350.48k £452.36k £519.00k
Income - Other £0 N/A £75.00k £0 £142.36k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £465.27k N/A £434.56k £470.00k £453.19k
Expenditure - Raising funds £53.91k N/A £98.13k £67.77k £76.27k
Expenditure - Governance £37.11k N/A £33.65k £33.21k £36.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £214.07k N/A £187.51k £199.59k £240.14k
Expenditure - Investment management £53.91k N/A £58.26k £67.77k £76.27k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £90.03k £0