25TH WARRINGTON EAST (ST WILFRID'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Group is part of the Scout Organisation, which aims to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potential. The Group endeavours to fulfill this aim by providing an enjoyable programme of training and activities based on the Scout Promise and Law and guided by adult leadership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warrington
Governance
- 02 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Farini | Chair | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Robinson | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew Green | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Yaxley | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Franks | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
KIM RAVENSCROFT | Trustee | 31 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR ULRICH VELTKAMP | Trustee | 13 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Richard Stockton | Trustee | 26 June 2009 |
|
|
||||
MRS M COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.73k | £21.84k | £29.90k | £36.21k | £34.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.89k | £12.94k | £28.81k | £29.64k | £39.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.41k | £1.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Middlehurst Road
Grappenhall
WARRINGTON
WA4 2LG
- Phone:
- 01925601136
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window