CHEEKY CHIMPS AT ASHCOTT

Charity number: 1045193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of reliable quality pre-school and wrap around childcare.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £156,002
Total expenditure: £155,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 March 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Cheeky Chimps Preschool (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Melissa Twitchell Chair 27 March 2023
None on record
Victoria Lawrence Trustee 22 January 2025
None on record
KATY Jamieson Trustee 07 November 2024
SOMERSET FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS
Received: 8 days late
Rose Francis Mia Stokes Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Clare Whitcombe Trustee 07 November 2022
None on record
Nikoletta Cox Trustee 07 November 2022
None on record
Vicky O'Brien Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Joanne Spencer Trustee 23 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £112.01k £115.21k £139.32k £145.01k £156.00k
Total expenditure £103.11k £106.28k £121.12k £137.37k £155.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £65.20k £75.12k £107.53k £950 £80.55k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cheeky Chimps
Ridgeway
Ashcott
BRIDGWATER
TA7 9PP
Phone:
01458210000