Shiva Charity UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In Nepal we have been rebuilding a school that had been completely destroyed in the 2015 earthquake. There are 5 new classrooms, a toilet block and a new drinking water filtration system. We have also recently repainted two school and repaired and replaced desks and chairs. We are currently sponsoring 6 children through their education at the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nepal
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 23 March 1995: Standard registration
- 12 May 2021: Funds received from 228545 ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES GRAND COUNCI...
- S H I V A (Working name)
- SHIVA (Working name)
- SHIVA CHARITY (Working name)
- SCHOOL HELPING INDIA VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- SCHOOLS HELPING INDIA VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Birkett | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adam Lythgoe | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Hobden | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Cooper | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Raymond Jenkins | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Garry Carr | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Graham HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.21k | £60.94k | £34.44k | £30.12k | £20.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.21k | £39.66k | £32.92k | £28.34k | £23.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAY 1997 BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(C) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 as amended on 23 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST PEOPLE IN INDIA AND SRI LANKA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SCHOOL CHILDREN IN THE CULTURE AND HISTORY OF INDIA AND SRI LANKA
Area of benefit
INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Westbury Crescent
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Avon
BS23 4RB
- Phone:
- 07779389778
- Email:
- clivehughes@mac.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window