Financial history OIZER DALIM TRUST

Charity number: 1045296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £267.03k £158.94k £111.58k £110.06k £127.29k
Total expenditure £72.40k £100.60k £146.41k £94.21k £111.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A