Trustees NORTH DUFFIELD UNDER FIVES

Charity Number: 1045432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bobbie Lay-Flurrie Chair 28 September 2024
NORTH DUFFIELD AND SKIPWITH PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Melissa Jane Green Trustee 02 February 2024
None on record
Laura Mary Roughley Trustee 28 September 2023
None on record
Lauren Jane Power Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Stephanie Margaret Duggan Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Jane Philpott Trustee 17 June 2019
NORTH DUFFIELD AND SKIPWITH PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION
Received: On time