THE SIR WINSTON CHURCHILL ARCHIVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust exists to advance the education of the public by acquiring, holding, restoring and maintaining the Churchill Archive and by making it available for the purposes of research and viewing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 April 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Paul Boateng PC | Chair | 09 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Caroline Eugenie Howell | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sharon Jayne Peacock | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Deborah Anne Prentice | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Jessica Pearsall Hall | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Melanie James | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr William Frame | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.32k | £57.62k | £20.41k | £80.16k | £83.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.47k | £61.23k | £66.43k | £84.51k | £87.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD APRIL 1995
Charitable objects
1.PRIMARILY THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY ACQUIRING HOLDING RESORING AND MAINTAINING THE CHURCHILL ARCHIVE AND BY MAKING IT AVAILABLE TO SCHOLARS FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESEARCH (AND PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH) AND AS APPROPRIATE TO THE PUBLIC FOR THE PURPOSE OF VIEWING 2.THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCHILL COLLEGE
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0DS
- Phone:
- 01223336087
- Email:
- archives@chu.cam.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window