PORTSMOUTH MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Portsmouth Music Festival provides a platform for amateur performance combined with an educational element from professional musicians, dancers and speakers. The Festival takes place during February and March. We welcome entries from all amateur musicians, speakers and dancers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 12 April 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA LAWLOR | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN FROGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY LANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL VERA FROGLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.79k | £3.44k | £19.51k | £23.86k | £27.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.97k | £4.15k | £18.99k | £21.02k | £23.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS IN MUSIC, SPEECH AND DRAMA AND DANCE IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 WOODLANDS AVENUE
EMSWORTH
PO10 7QE
- Phone:
- 01243375587
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window