Financial history THE WORTLEY ROTARY CLUB TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1045879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.29k £19.96k £6.46k £18.07k £22.27k
Total expenditure £10.71k £15.96k £5.33k £14.51k £9.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A