Financial history KOMEDIA PRODUCTIONS

Charity number: 1045924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.68k £34.28k £42.54k £62.93k £38.93k
Total expenditure £27.75k £34.33k £40.69k £56.47k £42.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.53k N/A £6.00k £6.00k £3.00k