THE FRIENDS OF STUDHAM CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to support our beautiful church, which was founded in 1220 AD, and the surrounding church grounds of St Mary The Virgin in Studham Bedfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 02 May 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek John Spriggs | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Metcalfe | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Richard Glover | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Howard Gee | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MCDOUGAL | Trustee | 14 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Eric Stanley Jacoby | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.24k | £1.28k | £1.93k | £6.64k | £5.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.51k | £293 | £4.27k | £520 | £453 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 4TH APRIL 1995
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE BUILDING KNOWN AS ST. MARY THE VIRGIN,STUDHAM, AS A PLACE OF ARCHITECTURAL AND HISTORIC INTEREST BY HELPING AND SUPPORTING THE VICAR, CHURCHWARDENS AND PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, STUDHAM, TO: (A)MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RENEW, IMPROVE, ENHANCE AND INSURE THE STRUCTURE AND FABRIC FURNISHINGS, MEMORIALS AND FITTINGS (INCLUDING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE DESCRIPTION "FITTINGS" ANY ORGAN OR OTHER MUSICAL INSTRUMENT OR MEANS OF MUSIC REPRODUCTION OR STATUE WHICH MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE WITHIN THE CHURCH AND EXCLUSIVELY IN CONNECTION THEREWITH) OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, STUDHAM.
Area of benefit
STUDHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
99 Holywell Road
Studham
Dunstable
LU6 2PD
- Phone:
- 01582873154
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window