Trustees THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP IN THE CHURCH IN WALES
Charity number: 1047004
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul John Pritchard | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Conway Rhys Jones | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynnette Esther Jones | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Samuel Theodore Patterson BSc BTh | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jeremy Bevan | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Melanie Amanda Prince BA MPhil | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Ven Andrew Stuart Grimwood | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Peter Owen Jones BSc, BA | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Merriel Wilkinson | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Roger Marshall | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Clive Howard Addison | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev James Brian Griffiths | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev Dean Aaron Roberts MA | Trustee | 11 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.