THE FRIENDS OF ASHBY ST. LEDGERS CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Continues to be the advancement of religion which includes the maintenance of the Church of the Blessed Virgin Mary and Saint Leodegarius.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Northamptonshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 09 June 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Howard | Chair | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Howard | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANET WEAVER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.14k | £1.35k | £1.40k | £600 | £13.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £398 | £47 | £398 | £276 | £152 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 March 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 APRIL 1995 AND AMENDED 7 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: 1.THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC, CONTENTS AND FURNISHINGS OF THE CHURCH OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY AND SAINT LEODEGARIUS IN THE VILLAGE OF ASHBY ST. LEDGERS IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE. 2.THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION AND WELLBEING OF THE BUILDING, STRUCTURE, WORKS OF ART, CHURCHYARD AND ECCLESIASTICAL PROPERTIES OF THE CHURCH. 3.THE ADVANCEMENT AMONG PEOPLE OF ALL AGES OF THE AWARENESS AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARCHITECTURAL AND HISTORICAL CHARACTER, QUALITY AND IMPORTANCE OF THE CHURCH, ITS CONTENTS AND FURNISHINGS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, ASHBY ST LEDGERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 The Stook
DAVENTRY
Northamptonshire
NN11 0SB
- Phone:
- 07825302144
- Email:
- Nigel.howard@zetnet.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window