SETTRINGTON ALL SAINTS CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund-raising for Children of Settrington All Saints' Church of England School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 June 1995: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF CHILDREN AT SETTRINGTON SCHOOL (FOCAS) (Previous name)
- SETTRINGTON ALL SAINTS' CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
- SETTRINGTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caryl Shephard | Chair | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Penny Aspey | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE SLANE SLOAN RAMSDEN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £736 | £100 | £1.60k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £624 | £624 | £908 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 351 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 March 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED 30 MARCH 2000 AND 12 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF SETTRINGTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL,RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Settrington Primary School,
Settrington
Malton
Malton
North Yorkshire
YO17 8NP
- Phone:
- 01944768238
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window