CARMARTHEN FAMILY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our role at Carmarthen Family Centre is to support families with young children by working in partnership to enhance family life and to offer opportunities for parents and children to improve their lives through education - empowering individuals and strengthening the communities in which they live.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,750 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 03 July 1995: Standard registration
- TY NI (Working name)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emlyn Schiavone | Chair | 21 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
Rosemary Laura Rowland | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Frances Elizabeth Owens | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD JOHN EDWARDS | Trustee | 28 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
DOUG ROSE | Trustee | 03 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
HELEN THOMAS | Trustee | 12 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||
NIGEL ROBERTS | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.38k | £47.43k | £61.94k | £56.98k | £49.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.33k | £47.20k | £45.82k | £45.41k | £43.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.50k | £18.30k | £14.92k | N/A | £9.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 FEBRUARY 1995 AS AMENDED 3 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED 8 MAY 1996
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CARMARTHEN AND DISTRICT (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS. TO WORK BI-LINGUALLY WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, RESIDENTS AND USERS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND EDUCATION WITH THE OBJEECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. B) THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. C) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESSTABLISHMENT OF, A FAMILY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY)
Area of benefit
CARMARTHEN AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ty Hapus Family Centre
114 Park Hall
CARMARTHEN
SA31 1JG
- Phone:
- 07508883857
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window