THE GRAMMAR SCHOOL AT LEEDS

Charity number: 1048304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of education for boys and girls aged 3 to 18

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 April 2003: Standard registration
  • 02 December 2009: Removed
  • 02 December 2009: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • GSAL (Working name)
  • LEEDS GIRLS HIGH SCHOOL (Working name)
  • LEEDS GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angus Matthew Martin Chair 12 November 2014
OPEN ARMS MALAWI
Received: On time
PAUL SIMPSON Trustee 01 May 2025
None on record
Dr Jasjit Singh Trustee 20 September 2024
SOUTH ASIAN ARTS-UK
Received: On time
Peter Ahye Trustee 20 September 2024
None on record
Beverley Ashby Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Robert Howse Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Patricia Jacqueline Sowa Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Philip Britton Trustee 01 September 2022
LEEDS GRAMMAR SCHOOL AND LEEDS GIRLS HIGH SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr Almas Khan Trustee 29 November 2018
None on record
Mark Richard Curle Trustee 27 September 2018
None on record
Jacqueline Alethea Harper Trustee 22 March 2018
LEEDS GRAMMAR SCHOOL AND LEEDS GIRLS HIGH SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Claire Vilarrubi Trustee 18 January 2018
TOGETHER WOMEN PROJECTS (YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE)
Received: On time
LEEDS GRAMMAR SCHOOL AND LEEDS GIRLS HIGH SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Joanne Semple Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
CHARLENE LYONS Trustee 01 September 2016
Leeds Hospitals Charity
Received: On time
Anthony John Walsh Trustee 23 September 2014
None on record
JEREMY CROSS Trustee 08 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £28.28m £30.81m £28.30m £30.61m £31.94m
Total expenditure £27.59m £28.61m £27.90m £29.78m £30.19m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £925.27k £132.81k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £575.26k £444.74k £324.13k £101.80k £102.80k
Income - Other trading activities £424.30k £227.53k £69.04k £411.82k £621.88k
Income - Charitable activities £27.08m £29.95m £27.72m £29.89m £30.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £198.75k £194.94k £189.24k £204.93k £343.80k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £25.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £26.20m £27.23m £26.75m £28.31m £27.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £301.91k £307.31k £272.84k £251.48k £567.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.40m £1.38m £1.14m £1.47m £2.25m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £3.35m £4.44m £4.37m £6.51m £50.24m
Long-term investments £24.57k £24.58k £24.62k £24.66k £24.92k
Other assets £20.11m £22.41m £23.93m £23.16m £19.15m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £13.01m £14.20m £15.25m £15.79m £49.18m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 23 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 05 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 10 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 18 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 11 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 MARCH 2003 AS AFFECTED BY A RESOLUTION PASSED 20 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE PARTICULARLY THOSE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE TO ATTEND, REMAIN OR TO TAKE FULL ADVANTAGE OF THE EDUCATIONAL PROVISION AT LEEDS GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 01 April 2003 : Standard registration
  • 02 December 2009 : Removed
  • 02 December 2009 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
LEEDS GRAMMAR SCHOOL
HARROGATE ROAD
LEEDS
LS17 8GS
Phone:
01132291552