KEMPTON GREAT ENGINES TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Museum based upon Kempton Pumping Station, Snakey Lane, Hanworth, Middlesex TW136XH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £18,875 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
54 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 August 1995: Standard registration
- KEMPTON GREAT ENGINES (Working name)
- Kempton Steam Museum (Working name)
- KEMPTON ENGINES TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew George Edwin Guenigault | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Brian Hewes | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Valerie Mills | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Abdullah Seba | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Richard Albanese | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|||||||
Felix Guy Charteris | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen William Fielding | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Christopher Wicks | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
David Robert Lawrie | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.46k | £41.92k | £62.17k | £68.52k | £111.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.56k | £28.82k | £56.30k | £71.46k | £90.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.88k | £18.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 AUGUST 1995 as amended on 19 May 2022 as amended on 06 Sep 2022 as amended on 16 Jan 2023 as amended on 16 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
The Objects of the Charity are for the public benefit: To promote, encourage, improve and advance the education of all about past, present and future importance of conserving and sustaining clean public water supplies by: (1) The collection, preservation, safeguarding, interpretation and display of equipment, objects and artefacts of whatsoever nature relating to, but not exclusively, the story of the Kempton Park site and its role in the supply of safe clean water to large areas of London; and (2) The operation of a museum at Kempton Park pumping station based on the appropriate sector standards which provides the public the opportunity to see the original steam engines working in their original setting alongside examples of evolving turbine technology; and (3) A wider understanding and appreciation of the importance of the industrial revolution in the social and economic development of Great Britain, including coal power, electricity generation, railways and civil engineering.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kempton Steam Museum
Kempton Park Water Treatment Works
Snakey Lane
FELTHAM
TW13 6XH
- Phone:
- 01568 720571
- Website:
-
kemptonsteam.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window