THE NEW MECHANICS INSTITUTION PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Benefiting the people of the Swindon area by preserving the built heritage (of particular historical, architectural or constructional interest); by developing and operating facilities for the education, recreation or other leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare; and providing activities supportive of community development, and of regeneration and renewal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 01 September 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Stanley Wright | Chair | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Aaron Luke Marchant | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Abigail Rockett | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
ROBERT CHARLES BARRETT | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Helen George | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sally Therese Cole | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.98k | £136.52k | £57.62k | £61.86k | £323.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.98k | £58.16k | £61.50k | £82.00k | £337.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.27k | £8.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 19 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 19 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED 13 APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON THE 23 OCTOBER 2003. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE WHATEVER OF THE HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE BOROUGH OFSWINDON IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS INCLUDING ANY BUILDING AS DEFINED IN SECTION 290(1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1971 OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE TOWNSPEOPLE OF SWINDON IN THE BOROUGH OF SWINDON IN THE COUNTY OF WILTSHIRE AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE 2. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE LIVING AND WORKING IN THE BOROUGH OF SWINDON 3. UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE BOROUGH OF SWINDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The New Mechanics Institute Trust
Central Community Centre
Emlyn Square
SWINDON
SN1 5BG
- Phone:
- 01793520592
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window