STANFORD INFANT SCHOOL PARENTS,TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School PTFA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 21 September 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Harper | Chair | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Victoria Segura Harvey | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Whittington | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Bates | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Rust-Gray | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Grey | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex Moore | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Parker | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sofia Wahlin | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Mowatt | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.43k | £2.05k | £9.24k | £23.54k | £27.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.15k | £6.94k | £11.74k | £23.68k | £35.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 July 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1986 AS AMENDED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1994.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY : PROMOTE THE BEST INTEREST OF THE SCHOOL AND OF THE CHILDREN ATTENDING IT. (B) FOSTER EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN PARENTS,STAFF AND THE ASSOCIATED COMMUNITY. (C) PROVIDE A FORUM FOR THE DISCUSSION OF ISSUES PERTAINING TO THE SCHOOL.(D) RAISE FUNDS FOR ITEMS ADDITIONAL TO THOSE PROVIDED BY THE AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stanford Infant School
Highcroft Villas
BRIGHTON
BN1 5PS
- Phone:
- 01273 555240
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window