THE PEARSON HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating and maintaining village hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
- Wokingham
Governance
- 25 September 1995: Standard registration
- PEARSON HALL SONNING (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LESLEY ANN BATES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev JAMIE TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Brita Christina Goodacre | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frank Head | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Rennie | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Bell | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR MICHAEL PATRICK MILES HART | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN BRIGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON PATRICIA ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.76k | £18.03k | £28.00k | £28.30k | £35.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.09k | £19.34k | £20.33k | £18.12k | £24.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 31 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
1). THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SONNING (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2) SUBJECT AS HEREINAFTER PROVIDED, THE COMMITTEE OF MANAGEMENT SHALL CONTINUE TO APPROPRIATE AND USE THE LAND AND BUILDINGS FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SONNING
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 West Drive
Sonning
READING
RG4 6GD
- Phone:
- 01189691181
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window