THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE)

Charity number: 1049541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious Services to the Greek Orthodox Community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £50,589
Total expenditure: £46,508

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 October 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY "THE TWELVE APOSTLES" HERTFORDSHIRE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kyriakos Kyriakou Trustee 07 November 2021
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
Theodoros Liousas Trustee 07 November 2021
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
Miltiades Rodosthenous Trustee 07 November 2021
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
Spyros Spyrou Trustee 07 November 2021
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
Archbishop Nikitas Lioulias Trustee 27 July 2019
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF MILTON KEYNES AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF COVENTRY
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST CONSTANTINE AND ST HELEN
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF HOLY ANARGYRI TRUST
Received: On time
ST JOHN THE BAPTIST GREEK ORTHODOX TRUST
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST KATHERINE
Received: On time
ST NICHOLAS GREEK ORTHODOX EDUCATIONAL CENTRE
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF BRISTOL
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN CHRYSOSTOM IN CHELTENHAM AND ENVIRONS
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Received: 90 days late
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST GEORGE THE MARTYR
Received: On time
Sts. Barbara, Phanourius and Paul the Apostle Greek Orthodox Church
Received: On time
SAINT NICHOLAS GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
ECCLESIASTICAL AND THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARNABAS GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY FUND
Received: On time
Sotirios Economou Trustee 10 January 2019
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
Evangelos Kritikos Trustee 09 July 2018
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
Chrisanthi Dina Constantinou Trustee 09 September 2017
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
JOHN CHRONIAS Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
DEMOS HABESHIS Trustee 14 April 2013
None on record
DIONYSIOS LIVERAS Trustee 03 January 2012
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
LOUIS LOIZOU Trustee
GREEK ORTHODOX ARCHDIOCESE THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN COMMUNITIES CENTRAL FUND LIMITED
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
YIOTA NICHOLAS Trustee
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
SAVVAS SAVVA Trustee
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
MICHAEL PILINA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £88.40k £76.24k £151.05k £20.25k £50.59k
Total expenditure £25.27k £50.45k £9.93k £17.50k £46.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Kentish Lane
Brookmans Park
Hatfield
Hertfordshire
AL9 6NG
Phone:
01707 650147