LEEK WOOTTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND V A PRIMARY COMMUNITY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the establishment building equipping and maintenance of the School. To advance the education of pupils in the School. To relieve pupils of the School who are in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 06 October 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Isabel Louise Digby | Chair | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
sylvia joy morgan | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev James Edward PERRYMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26 | £152 | £103 | £32 | £59 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 AUGUST 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ESTABLISHMENT BUILDING EQUIPPING AND MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOL.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.TO RELIEVE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL WHO ARE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 HILL WOOTTON ROAD
LEEK WOOTTON
WARWICK
CV35 7QL
- Phone:
- 01926850610
- Email:
- jim@leekwoottonchurch.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window