THE CHRISTIE CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1049751
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity supports the development of cancer prevention, treatment, research and education through investment in staff, equipment, facilities and other support services. The Charity does this by making grants to The Christie NHS Foundation Trust, and, occasionally to other related bodies.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 March 1996: Standard registration
  • 29 June 1998: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHRISTIE HOSPITAL CHARITABLE FUND (Working name)
  • THE CHRISTIE HOSPITAL CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £13.88m £15.33m £11.02m £13.20m £23.09m
Total expenditure £9.35m £41.56m £11.93m £12.47m £1.63m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £13.47m £14.93m £10.84m £12.71m £21.68m
Income - Other trading activities £77.27k £19.77k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £9.57k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £331.95k £377.83k £0 £45.61k £1.13m
Income - Other £0 £0 £179.70k £446.00k £280.11k
Income - Legacies £5.49m £4.96m £5.11m £5.26m £8.11m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.68m £38.66m £9.90m £10.08m £1.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.68m £2.89m £2.02m £2.40m £0
Expenditure - Governance £234.75k £231.54k £250.79k £233.24k £184.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £33.97m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Own use assets £0 £0 £850.00k £850.00k £5.05m
Long-term investments £1.39m £1.33m £593.10k £600.97k £582.97k
Other assets £53.50m £61.06m £59.20m £49.25m £60.14m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £23.27m £57.07m £36.65m £25.98m £19.62m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 08/12/1995 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 12/09/1997
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE ADULT LEUKAEMIA DEPARTMENT OF THE CHRISTIE HOSPITAL NHS TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 04 March 1996 : Standard registration
  • 29 June 1998 : Removed